This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/18/2019 at 18:00:35 (UTC).

GARCIA, ANA PATRICIA VS SARA CARDOZO (DECEASE)

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 GARCIA, ANA PATRICIA filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against SARA CARDOZO DECEASE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia, Ana Patricia

Respondents

Sara Cardozo (decease)

Molato, Felipe

Minor

cardona, Salome

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

08/12/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPLICATION TO MARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670008AMT PAID:$4.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3320-COPY2$1.00$2.00 3321-CERTIFIED1$2.00$2.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$4.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/12/2019 REGISTER#:267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Book/Page: 31566:393; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: AWARDING TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketUncontested Diss/CMC; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CMC 08/12/2019 @ 10:30 AM COURTROOM 29-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CMC, 07/29/2019 @ 10:30 AM COURTROOM 29-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/06/2019 @ 9:30 AM COURTROOM 29-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketIndex of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketDeath Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketBirth Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110035AMT PAID:$301.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2019 REGISTER#:211CASHIER:FARAHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketFiled at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Diss/CMC; Hearing Code: UCDCMC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less