This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/26/2021 at 08:09:24 (UTC).

GARCES, ELENA DANIELA VS MALDONADO, IGNACIO

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 GARCES, ELENA DANIELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MALDONADO, IGNACIO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garces, Elena Daniela

Respondent

Maldonado, Ignacio

Minor

Maldonado, Matias

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cintron Stern, Anya

Respondent Attorney

Fell, Brian David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2510041AMT PAID:$295.00 NAME:FELL, BRIAN DAVID 135 SAN LORENZO AVE STE 650 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-1526 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3303-COUNTER PETITION1$295.00$295.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$295.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/19/2021 REGISTER#:251CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Counter Petitions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Event Type: Event; Comments: HUSB'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: HUSB'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Waiver and Acceptance of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570032AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CINTRON STERN, ANYA LAW FIRM OF ANYA CINTRON STERN, P.A. 814 PONCE DECORAL GABLES FL 33134-3081 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/12/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570020AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:CINTRON STERN, ANYA LAW FIRM OF ANYA CINTRON STERN, P.A. 814 PONCE DECORAL GABLES FL 33134-3081 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/12/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Maldonado Ignacio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Temporary Relief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Temporary Relief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Temporary Relief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less