This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/03/2019 at 03:34:31 (UTC).

GALLARDO, MOISES H VS PONCE DE GALLARDO, VILMA JUDITH

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 GALLARDO, MOISES H filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PONCE DE GALLARDO, VILMA JUDITH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gallardo, Moises H

Respondent

Ponce de Gallardo, Vilma Judith

Minors

Gallardo, Brittany Guadalupe

Gallardo, Cristopher Alexander

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

11/25/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2440011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3320-COPY6$1.00$6.00 3321-CERTIFIED2$2.00$4.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2019 REGISTER#:244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31708:305; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Notice of Hrg for Respondent; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR11/25/19@ 9:30 A M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Certificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY -RESPONDENT'S Parties: Ponce de Gallardo Vilma Judith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Certificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY- PETITTIONERS Parties: Gallardo Moises H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Filing Child Support Guidelines Worksheet Attached; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gallardo Moises H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Acknowledgement of Courses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ponce de Gallardo Vilma Judith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800010AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/11/2019 REGISTER#:280CASHIER:NDEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.