This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/06/2021 at 07:30:49 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC VS RAUL MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAUL MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

Defendant

Martinez, Raul

Miami, FL 33125

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

10/22/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

10/13/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210027AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/25/2021 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:SCOOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martinez Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070044AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JO RAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065 ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3765.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant