This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 02:18:23 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC VS JOSE ARJONA

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE ARJONA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing LLC

Defendant

Arjona, Jose

Miami Beach, FL 33141-4741

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagen, Jessica Jo

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/22/2021 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

12/09/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

12/21/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

01/13/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

01/18/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Arjona Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560005AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2022REGISTER#:256CASHIER:LISAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Arjona Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Arjona Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670041AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2021REGISTER#:267CASHIER:BRYON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120003AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:11/24/2021REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J