This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/10/2020 at 18:03:00 (UTC).

GAIL DYE VS CHI-ADA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 GAIL DYE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHI-ADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dye, Gail

Defendant

CHI-ADA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie C Scott

Defendant Attorney

Trelvis D Randolph

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

02/11/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/06/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

01/02/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/02/2020 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

12/13/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Summons Returned - No Service

10/22/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

10/16/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/23/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover

08/20/2019 - Civil Cover

Privilege Log

03/11/2020 - Privilege Log

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/11/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatory

02/11/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/11/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/11/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/06/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

01/06/2020 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

01/06/2020 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/27/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Leslie C Scott; Dye Gail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHI-ADA Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHI-ADA Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530106AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LESLIE C SCOTT 233 E BAY ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202-3452 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3620334AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LESLIE C SCOTT 233 E BAY ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202-3452 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chi-Ada Corp is a litigant