*************A-01
03/02/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Miami-Dade, Florida
GA Telesis, LLC
United States Aircraft Insurance Group
United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc.
ACE American Insurance Co.
Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Endurance American Insurance Co.
Great American Insurance Co.
Price Forbes & Partners Ltd.
QBE Insurance Corporation
Starr Aviation Insurance Companies
Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Co.
W. Brown & Associates Insurance Services
XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Lancashire Airline War Consortium 9381
Lancashire Syndicates Limited
Underwriters at Lloyds London
Syndicates LRE 3010 and MMX 2010
Marks, Steven C
Humphries, Lauren Virginia
03/02/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
03/02/2023 - Complaint
03/20/2023 - Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference
03/20/2023 - Order:
03/20/2023 - Order:
03/20/2023 - Order:
04/17/2023 - Amended Complaint
04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline
04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline
04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline
04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline
05/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance
05/09/2023 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice
05/04/2023 - Notice of Appearance
05/18/2023 - Order:
05/25/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INITIAL CMC
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNOPPOSED/GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, ETC.
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090024AMT PAID:$100.00NAME:HUMPHRIES, LAUREN VIRGINIA501 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 1700TAMPA FL 33602COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3176-NON-FLA ATTORNEY F1$100.00$100.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$100.00RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: CORRECTED-PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS: LAUREN.HUMPHRIES@BIPC.COM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Humphries Lauren Virginia; United States Aircraft Insurance Group; United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.; Endurance American Insurance Co.; Great American Insurance Co.; Price Forbes & Partners Ltd.; QBE Insurance Corporation; Starr Aviation Insurance Companies; Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Co.; W. Brown & Associates Insurance Services; XL Specialty Insurance Co.; Underwriters at Lloyds London
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MANDATORY ORDER TO CONFER AND CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENT
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE AND ORDER OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM REQUIREMENTS
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE AND ORDER OF ADHERENCE TO COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION SECTION PROCEDURES
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND TO PREPARE A MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200025AMT PAID:$426.00NAME:MARKS, STEVEN CPODHURST ORSECK, P.A. SUNTRUST INTERNATIONAL CENTEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$25.00$25.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$426.00RECEIPT DATE:03/07/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less