This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 11:51:51 (UTC).

GA TELESIS, LLC VS UNITED STATES AIRCRAFT INSURANCE GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 GA TELESIS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED STATES AIRCRAFT INSURANCE GROUP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GA Telesis, LLC

Defendants

United States Aircraft Insurance Group

United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc.

ACE American Insurance Co.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.

Endurance American Insurance Co.

Great American Insurance Co.

Price Forbes & Partners Ltd.

QBE Insurance Corporation

Starr Aviation Insurance Companies

Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Co.

W. Brown & Associates Insurance Services

XL Specialty Insurance Co.

Lancashire Airline War Consortium 9381

Lancashire Syndicates Limited

Underwriters at Lloyds London

Syndicates LRE 3010 and MMX 2010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marks, Steven C

Defendant Attorney

Humphries, Lauren Virginia

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/02/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/02/2023 - Complaint

Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

03/20/2023 - Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

Order:

03/20/2023 - Order:

Order:

03/20/2023 - Order:

Order:

03/20/2023 - Order:

Amended Complaint

04/17/2023 - Amended Complaint

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Appearance

05/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Pro Hac Vice

05/09/2023 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Appearance

05/04/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Order:

05/18/2023 - Order:

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

05/25/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INITIAL CMC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNOPPOSED/GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, ETC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090024AMT PAID:$100.00NAME:HUMPHRIES, LAUREN VIRGINIA501 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 1700TAMPA FL 33602COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3176-NON-FLA ATTORNEY F1$100.00$100.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$100.00RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: CORRECTED-PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS: LAUREN.HUMPHRIES@BIPC.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Humphries Lauren Virginia; United States Aircraft Insurance Group; United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.; Endurance American Insurance Co.; Great American Insurance Co.; Price Forbes & Partners Ltd.; QBE Insurance Corporation; Starr Aviation Insurance Companies; Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Co.; W. Brown & Associates Insurance Services; XL Specialty Insurance Co.; Underwriters at Lloyds London

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MANDATORY ORDER TO CONFER AND CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE AND ORDER OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM REQUIREMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE AND ORDER OF ADHERENCE TO COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION SECTION PROCEDURES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND TO PREPARE A MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200025AMT PAID:$426.00NAME:MARKS, STEVEN CPODHURST ORSECK, P.A. SUNTRUST INTERNATIONAL CENTEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$25.00$25.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$426.00RECEIPT DATE:03/07/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less