This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/13/2020 at 00:48:17 (UTC).

G P PROPERTY RENTALS (LLC) VS. JOSE LARES

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 G P PROPERTY RENTALS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSE LARES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

G P Property Rentals, LLC

G P Property Rentals (LLC)

Defendant

Lares, Jose

Not Classified By Court

L/T

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

03/05/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee

03/05/2020 - Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee

Final Judgment by Judge

03/05/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Default

03/03/2020 - Default

Motion for Default

02/24/2020 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

02/24/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Non-Payment

02/24/2020 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Affidavit as to Costs

02/24/2020 - Affidavit as to Costs

Service Returned

02/15/2020 - Service Returned

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lares Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31843:4269; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lares Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lares Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lares Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lares Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2190007AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$390.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/202

    Read MoreRead Less