This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/14/2020 at 01:29:17 (UTC).

FRANCISCO O LOPEZ VS. TIANA JINAY BENNETT

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 FRANCISCO O LOPEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TIANA JINAY BENNETT. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, FRANCISCO O

Defendant

BENNETT, TIANA JINAY

Not Classified By Court

L&T

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

12/19/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Writ of Possession Issued

12/27/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

12/19/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Service Returned

12/17/2019 - Service Returned

Affidavit as to Costs

12/17/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT TO SHERIFF WITH $115 M/O Parties: BENNETT TIANA JINAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31751:1161; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BENNETT TIANA JINAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE 05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BENNETT TIANA JINAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: NON PAYMENT OF RENT AND NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590001AMT PAID:$235.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2140-SHERIFF'S FEE1$40.00$40.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BENNETT TIANA JINAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act Bond; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.