This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 02:44:57 (UTC).

FPA MULTIFAMILY, LLC ET AL VS LNR PARTNERS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 FPA MULTIFAMILY, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LNR PARTNERS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FPA Multifamily, LLC

VA7 Concord Chase, LLC

VA7 Mitchell Park, LLC

Defendant

LNR Partners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bowers, Amy

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/24/2021 - Complaint

Notice of Filing:

06/29/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

07/12/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

07/22/2021 - Notice:

Order of Dismissal

11/04/2021 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties: LNR Partners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 7-29-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580089AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BOWERS, AMY 9350 S DIXIE HWY STE 1560 MIAMI FL 33156-2944 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LNR PARTNERS LLC is a litigant