This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 12:03:33 (UTC).

FORETHOUGHT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LUISA BAEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 FORETHOUGHT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LUISA BAEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forethought Life Insurance Company

Defendants

BAEZ, LUISA

FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC

MANGO HILL CONDOMINIUM NO. 4, INC.

BAEZ, LUISA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melanson, Kyle Robert

 

Court Documents

Notice:

05/02/2023 - Notice:

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Default

02/22/2023 - Default

Non-Military Affidavit

02/20/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

02/20/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice:

01/31/2023 - Notice:

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/31/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/30/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

01/30/2023 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

01/17/2023 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

01/13/2023 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/13/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Email Notice:

01/13/2023 - Email Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BAEZ LUISA; FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC; MANGO HILL CONDOMINIUM NO. 4 INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DROPPING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUISA BAEZ A/K/A LUISA M. BAEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33543:4470; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@TMPPLLC.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less