This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/27/2023 at 03:36:15 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS MICHELLE LIZCANO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELLE LIZCANO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

LIZCANO, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marvin Solomon

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/12/2023 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

02/22/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650048AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/22/2023REGISTER#:265CASHIER:FERGUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; LIZCANO MICHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100073AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MARVIN SOLOMON1702 N FLORIDA AVETAMPA FL 33602-2230COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less