Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/04/2021 at 08:38:46 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CR CO (LLC) VS LINA M MESA FRANCO

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 FORD MOTOR CR CO LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINA M MESA FRANCO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Cr Co (LLC)

Defendant

Mesa Franco, Lina M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Ingino

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620102AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MICHAEL J. INGINO 1333 S UNIVERSITY DR STE 201 PLANTATION FL 33324-4001 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/31/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mesa Franco Lina M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600185AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MICHAEL J. INGINO 1333 S UNIVERSITY DR STE 201 PLANTATION FL 33324-4001 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/25/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $10430.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James