This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 14:22:46 (UTC).

FLORIDA SPINE & ORTHOPEDICS, INC., VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 FLORIDA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS, INC , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA SPINE & ORTHOPEDICS, INC.,

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Assignee

De Los Reyes, Jesus Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Eric M Polsky Esq

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Admissions

03/14/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/14/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/14/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Service of Process

03/23/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

04/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Witness List

04/23/2023 - Witness List

Exhibit List

04/23/2023 - Exhibit List

Witness List

04/23/2023 - Witness List

Motion for Extension of Time

04/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/01/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event; Comments: AS TO REASONABLENESS, RELATION AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230054AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/07/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230007AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less