This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/26/2021 at 05:39:46 (UTC).

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC

Assignor

Wilson, Jasmine

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Tolgyesi, Anthony L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/10/2020 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

07/07/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

09/18/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

10/30/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

10/30/2020 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

10/30/2020 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

11/11/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

11/13/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Extension of Time

12/03/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

12/07/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32226:4681; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110025AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770027AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.