This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/14/2022 at 08:52:25 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB VS DANIEL DESORMEAU ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DANIEL DESORMEAU. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flagstar Bank, FSB

Defendants

Desormeau, Daniel

Desmoreau, Ari

Possession 1, Unknown Party in

Possession 2, Unknown Party in

Chestnut Woods Homeowners Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kasper, Kathryn Ishee

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/01/2022 - Complaint

Notice:

11/01/2022 - Notice:

Lis Pendens

11/02/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/10/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100131AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEETIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. 1201 SOUTH ORLANDO AVE.SUIWINTER PARK FL 32789COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:11/09/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Possession 1 Unknown Party in

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Chestnut Woods Homeowners Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: Possession 1 Unknown Party in

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Desmoreau Ari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050155AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEETIFFANY & BOSCO, P.A. 1201 SOUTH ORLANDO AVE.SUIWINTER PARK FL 32789COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:11/03/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33453:2188; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSS-CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasper, Kathryn I