This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:45:09 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS ADRIAN A RONDOY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADRIAN A RONDOY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

Defendant

RONDOY, ADRIAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chamblee, Brandy L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/31/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Service Returned

03/15/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

03/29/2023 - Answer

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/09/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RONDOY ADRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RONDOY ADRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170010AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2023REGISTER#:217CASHIER:EGMELO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RONDOY ADRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190006AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:CHAMBLEE, BRANDY LP O BOX 4953MONTGOMERY AL 36103COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less