This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/26/2019 at 06:57:15 (UTC).

FIRST EXCELLENT THERAPY, LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 FIRST EXCELLENT THERAPY, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST EXCELLENT THERAPY, LLC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Quintanal, Barbara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yulexy Solis Garcia

Defendant Attorney

White, Camille A.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

03/13/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Response to Request for Admissions

05/17/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Order:

08/05/2019 - Order:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/27/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Admissions

02/04/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/11/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Statement of Claim

02/04/2019 - Statement of Claim

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/17/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion:

05/17/2019 - Motion:

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

Request for Production

02/04/2019 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/11/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160052AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/19/2019 REGISTER#:216CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480145AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.