This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 02:58:28 (UTC).

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC.

MACKO (PR), MELISSA KHAN

MACKO (ESTATE OF), DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howell, Phillip Steven

Defendant Attorneys

Graham, III, Dillon

Henry, David S.

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/12/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Amended Notice

04/12/2023 - Amended Notice

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

02/14/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Unavailability/absence

02/14/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice:

02/14/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

02/09/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

02/09/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

02/09/2023 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Order for Substitution of Counsel

02/06/2023 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

02/03/2023 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

02/03/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

01/31/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Response to Motion

01/30/2023 - Response to Motion

Response to Motion

01/27/2023 - Response to Motion

Notice:

01/27/2023 - Notice:

Response:

01/25/2023 - Response:

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS: DHENRY@KELLEYKRONENBERG.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL LEGAL AUTHORITY TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF JOINDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF JOINDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 02/15/2023 - 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MACKO (PR) MELISSA KHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990053AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:HOWELL, PHILLIP STEVEN110 E. BROWARD BLVD SUITE 1890FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2022REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less