This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/05/2021 at 13:13:27 (UTC).

FINVARB GROUP, LLC ET AL VS EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 FINVARB GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FINVARB GROUP, LLC

1530 WASHINGTON AVENUE LTD.

JUPITER CY, LLC

RIVERWALK CY, LLC

SOBE 17 OWNER, LLC

TEMPE RI, LLC

SOBE ALTON, LLC

Defendants

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS (CONSORTIUM #9226)

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO POLI

HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marino, Stephen A, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Vander Klok, Jedidiah D

J Trumon Philips

Steven J Brodie

RASCHKE, HEIDI HUDSON

Daechsel, Andrew K

Other Attorneys

Irel, Monica Liliana

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

08/02/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

07/20/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process

07/08/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

06/29/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover

06/02/2021 - Civil Cover

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irel Monica Liliana; WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Vander Klok Jedidiah D; AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: J Trumon Philips; INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: THE CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Steven J Brodie; Daechsel Andrew K; RASCHKE HEIDI HUDSON; WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Transfer Calendar; Hearing Code: TRAN; Hearing Time: 9:20AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CBL 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Transfer Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 22, 2021 AT 9:20AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600210AMT PAID:$428.50 NAME:MARINO, STEPHEN A, JR. VER PLOEG & MARINO PA 100 SE 2ND STREET SUITE 3300 MIAMI FL 33131-2100 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$27.50$27.50 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$428.50 RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant