Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/22/2021 at 06:33:42 (UTC).

FAITH MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 FAITH MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faith Medical Group, Inc.

Assignor

Montero, Raul

Defendant

Infinity Assurance Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pomares, Fernando J

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

04/12/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

04/08/2021 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

04/08/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Assurance Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250031AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/12/2021 REGISTER#:225CASHIER:GERTAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2780125AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:POMARES, FERNANDO J 12002 SW 128TH CT STE 104 MIAMI FL 33186-4641 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2021 REGISTER#:278CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Faith Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Assurance Insurance Company is a litigant