This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/31/2020 at 06:54:33 (UTC).

FACADE FLORIDA ADJUSTING CO & ESTIMATORS CORP VS FRANCISCO L GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 FACADE FLORIDA ADJUSTING CO ESTIMATORS CORP filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCISCO L GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FACADE FLORIDA ADJUSTING CO & ESTIMATORS CORP

Defendant

GONZALEZ, FRANCISCO L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molina, Mario

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

04/07/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090082AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/21/2020 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GONZALEZ FRANCISCO L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430018AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:MOLINA, MARIO 2750 SW 145TH AVENUE SUITE 509 MIRAMAR FL 33207 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.