This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/10/2020 at 23:10:08 (UTC).

EVERSLY WALTERS VS CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 EVERSLY WALTERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walters, Eversly

Defendant

Castle Key Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erik D Diener

Defendant Attorney

Quintero, Christie L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

07/01/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion/petit for Enforcement

05/28/2020 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Order on Motion to Compel

03/02/2020 - Order on Motion to Compel

AgreedOrder

01/23/2020 - AgreedOrder

Motion to Abate

01/16/2020 - Motion to Abate

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/02/2020 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Extension of Time

12/26/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/25/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/22/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

Email Notice:

11/18/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

11/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/18/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/11/2020 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEFT'S MOTOIN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Abate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Quintero Christie L; Castle Key Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Castle Key Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3420265AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ERIK D DIENER 8751 W BROWARD BLVD STE 404 PLANTATION FL 33324-2632 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600366AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ERIK D DIENER 8751 W BROWARD BLVD STE 404 PLANTATION FL 33324-2632 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.