This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 18:30:47 (UTC).

ESTHER-MERRICK PROPERTIES, INC. VS GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 ESTHER-MERRICK PROPERTIES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTHER-MERRICK PROPERTIES, INC.

Defendant

GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nunez, Bobby

Defendant Attorney

Levin, David B

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/08/2022 - Complaint

Amended Complaint

06/09/2022 - Amended Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/10/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/24/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/27/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

07/07/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

07/25/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/25/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/25/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Reply

08/03/2022 - Reply

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANDMOTION TO STRIKE IMPROPER DEFENSES/ALLEGATIONS BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140038AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:NUNEZ, BOBBYNU EZ LAW, P.L. 3191 CORAL WAY SUITE 405MIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090036AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:NUNEZ, BOBBYNU EZ LAW, P.L. 3191 CORAL WAY SUITE 405MIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Lakes Insurance SE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levin, David B