This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 01:10:41 (UTC).

ESPERANZA CASTELLANO VS SANTANDER ENTERPRISES INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 ESPERANZA CASTELLANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANTANDER ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTELLANO, ESPERANZA

Defendant

ENTERPRISES INC., SANTANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonah M Wolfson

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/01/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

06/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

06/01/2022 - Email Notice:

Request for Copies

06/01/2022 - Request for Copies

Request for Production

06/01/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

07/06/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

07/07/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Compliance

07/07/2022 - Notice of Compliance

Motion to Dismiss

07/20/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

07/29/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

08/02/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Interrogatory

08/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

08/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/05/2022 - Request for Production

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEPTEMBER 27, 2022 AT 2 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: ENTERPRISES INC. SANTANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190061AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JONAH M WOLFSONWOLFSON LAW FIRM LLP 3399 SW 3RD AVEMIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160183AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JONAH M WOLFSONWOLFSON LAW FIRM LLP 3399 SW 3RD AVEMIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE3@WOLFSONLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enterprise, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLFSON, JONAH