This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/04/2021 at 00:38:23 (UTC).

ERICKA GONCALVES VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 ERICKA GONCALVES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONCALVES, ERICKA

Defendants

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

RASIER LLC

KRAUS, DAVID

RASIER (FL), LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Snyder, Barry M.

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

10/11/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040067AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:SNYDER, BARRY M. 16211 NE 12TH AVE SUITE 200 NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33162-452 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/23/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: RASIER (FL) LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: RASIER (FL) LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000259AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SNYDER, BARRY M. 16211 NE 12TH AVE SUITE 200 NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33162-452 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2021 REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Snyder, Barry M.