This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 15:26:42 (UTC).

EREL LAUFER VS GIDEON GRATSIANI

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 EREL LAUFER filed an Other lawsuit against GIDEON GRATSIANI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laufer, Erel

Defendant

Gratsiani, Gideon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin S Moselle

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/15/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Voluntary Dismissal

04/30/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32487:1642; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties: Gratsiani Gideon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gratsiani Gideon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500232AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROBIN S MOSELLEROGERS, MORRIS & ZIEGLER, LLP 1401 E. BROWARD BLVDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2021REGISTER#:250CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500012AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ROBIN S MOSELLEROGERS, MORRIS & ZIEGLER, LLP 1401 E. BROWARD BLVDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2021REGISTER#:250CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moselle, Robin Sobo