This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/25/2021 at 10:40:18 (UTC).

EQUITYMAX, INC VS JOSEPH FISHER, III

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 EQUITYMAX, INC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH FISHER, III. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equitymax, Inc

Defendants

Fisher, Joseph, III

Fisher, Joseph T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Treco, William A., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

11/23/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

11/23/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

11/18/2021 - Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

11/16/2021 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Notice of Hearing-

11/16/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Affidavit of Indebtedness

11/15/2021 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Affidavit as to Costs

11/09/2021 - Affidavit as to Costs

Lis Pendens

08/18/2021 - Lis Pendens

Motion for Default

10/21/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

10/20/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

10/18/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

10/18/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Default Not Entered

10/14/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

10/13/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

10/12/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

09/29/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Filing:

09/29/2021 - Notice of Filing:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT||MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-23-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970147AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:TRECO, WILLIAM A., ESQJEORME L. TEPPS, P.A. 499 NW 70 AVENUE, SUITE 112PLANTATION FL 33317COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:08/21/2021REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Fisher Joseph III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990005AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:TRECO, WILLIAM A., ESQJEORME L. TEPPS, P.A. 499 NW 70 AVENUE, SUITE 112PLANTATION FL 33317COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32696:4786; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equitymax Inc Pension Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Treco, William A