This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/02/2021 at 02:41:17 (UTC).

EMS MANAGEMENT VS FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 EMS MANAGEMENT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLORIDA POWER LIGHT COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMS Management

Defendant

Florida Power & Light Company

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/05/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Affidavit of Indigency

10/05/2021 - Affidavit of Indigency

Complaint

10/06/2021 - Complaint

Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

10/13/2021 - Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790005AMT PAID:$40.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3140-SHERIFF'S FEE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:JFONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:JFONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: CUSTOMER REQUEST TO TAKE SUMMONS TO SHERIFFS OFFICE Parties: Florida Power & Light Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010001AMT PAID:$401.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/14/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EMS Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant