This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/31/2021 at 10:40:24 (UTC).

EMS DRY TITAN LLC VS AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 EMS DRY TITAN LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMS DRY TITAN LLC

Assignor

PALENZUELA, PATRICIA

Defendants

INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICA SECURITY

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Borshchukov Vyacheslav

Defendant Attorney

Docheva, Desislava K., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

01/25/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Jury Trial

01/22/2021 - Notice of Jury Trial

Memorandum of Disposition

12/17/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/17/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

12/10/2020 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing:

12/01/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

11/16/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

11/05/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

11/05/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

11/02/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

09/09/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

09/08/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Extending Time for

08/24/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Appearance

08/18/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/14/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/24/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

07/21/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

07/21/2020 - Request for Admissions

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2021 AND CALENDAR CALL ON SEPTEMBER 13, 2021 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/07/20@1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Docheva Desislava K. ESQ; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600067AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BORSHCHUKOV VYACHESLAV 4141 NAUTILUS DR APT 2B MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-2871 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600014AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:BORSHCHUKOV VYACHESLAV 4141 NAUTILUS DR APT 2B MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-2871 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Office of America, Inc. a Florida Corporation doing business as IOA Insurance Services is a litigant

Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Docheva, Desislava K