This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/01/2023 at 02:15:53 (UTC).

EMMANUELLA PETION VS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 EMMANUELLA PETION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Petion, Emmanuella

Defendants

Board of County Commissioners, Miami-Dade County

Escarra, Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John, Elroy M., Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/15/2022 - Complaint

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/09/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order:

02/01/2023 - Order:

Order of Dismissal

04/14/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

04/17/2023 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33669:3666; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33669:2817; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Board of County Commissioners Miami-Dade County; Escarra Luis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SERVE THE PROPER DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120140AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JOHN, ELROY M., JR.2131 HOLLYWOOD BLVD., SUITE 501AHOLLYWOOD FL 33020COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less