This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2020 at 02:47:33 (UTC).

EMILY INVESTMENTS SVCS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO VS UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 EMILY INVESTMENTS SVCS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

a Florida Limited Liability Co, Emily Investments Svcs, LL

Defendant

Underwriters at Lloyds, London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gelber, Mathew R., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

10/05/2020 - Notice of Filing:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request:

09/24/2020 - Request:

Notice of Interrogatory

09/24/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

09/24/2020 - Request for Production

Complaint

09/24/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Underwriters at Lloyds London

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Underwriters at Lloyds London

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760122AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GELBER, MATHEW R., ESQ GOLD LITIGATION 220 SW 16 ST. DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33442 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760082AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GELBER, MATHEW R., ESQ GOLD LITIGATION 220 SW 16 ST. DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33442 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less