This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/05/2020 at 23:30:13 (UTC).

EMERGENCY REMEDIATION SERVICES, LLC. VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 EMERGENCY REMEDIATION SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emergency Remediation Services, LLC.

Assignor

Perez, Antonio Priede

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vargas, Andrew Joseph

Defendant Attorneys

Tuttle, Jody Alta

Vaccaro, Noelia C., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

01/13/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

03/27/2020 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Request for Production

10/09/2019 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/04/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

06/04/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Interrogatory

10/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

05/09/2020 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Hearing-

04/10/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Response to Request for Production

06/23/2020 - Response to Request for Production

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 5, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT TO RESPOND WITHIN 30 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5TH DAY OF JUNE, 2020, AT 9:00 A.M.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620039AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/17/2019 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:MARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3630021AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:VARGAS, ANDREW JOSEPH 815 PONCE DE LEON BLVD CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3038 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emergency Remediation Services, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vaccaro, Noelia C., ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUTTLE ESQ, JODY