This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:35:42 (UTC).

EMCY INVESTMENTS CORP. VS PEREZ, HECTOR

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 EMCY INVESTMENTS CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PEREZ, HECTOR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emcy Investments Corp.

Defendants

Perez, Hector

Perez, Haydee

Perez, Leticia

Worldwide Asset Purchasing II, LLC

Cach LLC

Branch Banking and Trust Company

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

American Express Centurion Bank

Florida Department of Revenue

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Regions Bank

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance, Co.

Citibank (South Dakota) NA

Asset Acceptance LLC

Vargas, Marliss

Dade County Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kass, Mark E.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Diligent Search

09/15/2021 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Summons Returned - No Service

09/15/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Affidavit of Diligent Search

09/15/2021 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Summons Returned - No Service

09/15/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice of Default Not Entered

09/03/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Notice of Default Not Entered

09/03/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Default

09/03/2021 - Default

Motion for Default

09/01/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

08/31/2021 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

05/27/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/27/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

05/27/2021 - Lis Pendens

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Perez Leticia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Perez Haydee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dade County Federal Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Florida Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Worldwide Asset Purchasing II LLC; Cach LLC; Branch Banking and Trust Company; Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dade County Federal Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Florida Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570217AMT PAID:$433.50 NAME:KASS, MARK E. MARK EVANS KASS PA 1497 NW 7TH ST MIAMI FL 33125-3640 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$27.50$27.50 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$433.50 RECEIPT DATE:05/28/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32545:1864; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant