This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/05/2021 at 12:50:32 (UTC).

ELSY BENITEZ ET AL VS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 ELSY BENITEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benitez, Elsy

Lacayo, Luis Antonio

Defendants

Miami-Dade County

Chi-Ada Corporation

U.S. Security Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan M Feldman

Defendant Attorneys

Ramos-Barreau, Nicole

Frastai, Daniel

Behar, Aaron, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion:

08/02/2021 - Motion:

Email Notice:

07/29/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

07/26/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Appearance

07/08/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

06/14/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Appearance

07/29/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

07/27/2021 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Motion:

07/23/2021 - Motion:

Notice of Appearance

07/13/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

07/08/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

06/28/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/25/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC.S MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO COUNTS ONE, TWO, AND THREE OF PLAINTIFFSCOMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT FOUR OF PLAINTIFFSCOMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MIAMI DADE COUNTY'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08-26-2021 @ 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AB@BEHARBEHAR.COM; MH@BEHARBEHAR.COM; E-SERVICE@BEHARBEHAR.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Behar Aaron ESQ; Chi-Ada Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Chi-Ada Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620066AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:EVAN M FELDMAN 5975 SUNSET DR STE 601 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/18/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670205AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:EVAN M FELDMAN 5975 SUNSET DR STE 601 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2021 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chi-Ada Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Miami Dade County Fire Rescue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frastai, Daniel