This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/20/2022 at 10:30:35 (UTC).

ELEANOR SMITH VS BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORP D/B/A

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 ELEANOR SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORP D/B/A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Eleanor

Defendant

Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corp d/b/a

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Asconape

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/04/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

11/04/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

11/04/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/04/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/16/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

12/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/01/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

12/01/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

12/01/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corp d/b/a

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140065AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JUAN ASCONAPE7111 FAIRWAY DR STE 105PALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33418-42COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/16/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180112AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JUAN ASCONAPE7111 FAIRWAY DR STE 105PALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33418-42COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/08/2022REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@SCHWEDLAWFIRM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less