This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 22:03:26 (UTC).

EDWARD ROJO ET AL VS DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 EDWARD ROJO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rojo, Edward

Lastra, Rene

Defendants

Domino's Pizza, LLC

Doe, John

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/07/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/07/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

07/06/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

07/21/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

07/26/2022 - Order Extending Time for

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Domino's Pizza LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020104AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:HAIRSTON,SR., SHAWN L.M.2000 PONCE DE LEON BLVD SUITE 643MIAMI FL 33131-1817COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060070AMT PAID:$401.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant