This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/06/2020 at 01:28:25 (UTC).

EDWARD R. BLUMBERG VS RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 EDWARD R BLUMBERG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RENAISSANCE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blumberg, Edward R.

Defendants

Clark, Infonta

Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC

The Renaissance Tampa International Plaza Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caballero, Cosme

Defendant Attorney

Feldman, Andrew S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

05/21/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

05/20/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice:

10/17/2019 - Notice:

Amended Motion

10/10/2019 - Amended Motion

Motion to Dismiss

10/09/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

10/08/2019 - Service Returned

Request for Production

08/22/2019 - Request for Production

Complaint

08/22/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BASED ON IMPROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07-29-2020 AT 11:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DECLARATION OF INFONTA CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BASED ON IMPROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Feldman Andrew S.; Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100025AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/28/2019 REGISTER#:210CASHIER:JENNM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC; Clark Infonta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550004AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:CABALLERO, COSME 100 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 2802 MIAMI FL 33132-2305 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caballero, Cosme