This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/25/2020 at 08:41:33 (UTC).

EDWARD LAZZARIN, M.D. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 EDWARD LAZZARIN, M D filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Lazzarin, M.D.

Assignor

Alas, Darian

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis J Mertz

Defendant Attorney

King, Ann H

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

05/20/2020 - Motion to Compel

Privilege Log

05/06/2020 - Privilege Log

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/06/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

05/06/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Mot to File Amended Complaint

04/30/2020 - Mot to File Amended Complaint

Request for Production

04/27/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/27/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

04/27/2020 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

04/27/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/27/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

04/21/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

04/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/02/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/31/2020 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

02/20/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/20/2020 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mot to File Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740031AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2020 REGISTER#:274CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440029AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:LEWIS J MERTZ MERTZ LAW GROUP 4970 SW 72ND AVENUE SUITE 109 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.