This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/07/2019 at 06:07:08 (UTC).

EDUARDO J. GARRIDO, D.C. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 EDUARDO J GARRIDO, D C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDUARDO J. GARRIDO, D.C.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

GARRIDO, GERALDIN C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dapena, Jose A.

Defendant Attorneys

Jarred S Dichek

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

02/04/2019 - Statement of Claim

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

03/18/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Dismissal

07/26/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

04/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Email Notice:

03/18/2019 - Email Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

05/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

04/08/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

04/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

02/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31547:2191; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: & STIPULATED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2910010AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2019 REGISTER#:291CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480140AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:DAPENA, JOSE A. 5975 SUNSET DR STE 102 MIAMI FL 33143-5198 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.