This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/30/2021 at 00:27:35 (UTC).

EASTERN FUNDING LLC VS JOAQUIN CEPEDA

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 EASTERN FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOAQUIN CEPEDA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eastern Funding LLC

Defendant

Cepeda, Joaquin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald M Emanuel

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of:

11/17/2021 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit as to Costs

11/17/2021 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/17/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order of Default

07/28/2021 - Order of Default

Motion for Default

07/26/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

07/23/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Non-Military Affidavit

07/23/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

07/23/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

07/14/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

07/12/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

07/12/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Default Not Entered

06/25/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

06/24/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

06/02/2021 - Service Returned

Complaint

04/05/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/05/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/06/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF ATTORNEY'S TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGAINST JOAQUIN CEPEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cepeda Joaquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cepeda Joaquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cepeda Joaquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cepeda Joaquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670070AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:RONALD M EMANUEL7900 PETERS RD STE B100PLANTATION FL 33324-4044COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2021REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670004AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:RONALD M EMANUEL7900 PETERS RD STE B100PLANTATION FL 33324-4044COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2021REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cepeda Joaquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMANUEL ESQ, RONALD M