This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/01/2020 at 11:53:51 (UTC).

EAST COAST MEDICAL & REHAB VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 EAST COAST MEDICAL REHAB filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST COAST MEDICAL & REHAB

Assignor

Dasilva, Carlos

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Nanes, Tamara, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/26/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Filing:

04/17/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Jury Trial

04/16/2020 - Notice of Jury Trial

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/26/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion in Limine

03/26/2020 - Motion in Limine

Motion:

03/26/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

03/26/2020 - Motion:

Request for Admissions

03/26/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/26/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

03/26/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

03/26/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

03/26/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

03/26/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

03/25/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/25/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

03/13/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

02/24/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31947:4557; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL ADMISSIONS REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2780048AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2020 REGISTER#:278CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EAST COAST MEDICAL & REHAB; INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480090AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.