This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/09/2020 at 00:11:39 (UTC).

EAST COAST MEDICAL REHAB, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 EAST COAST MEDICAL REHAB, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST COAST MEDICAL REHAB, INC.

Assignor

SIERRA, JULIA

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorneys

Walsh, Michael S

Mabrouk, Walid O

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/01/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatory

06/21/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion to Compel

06/13/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

05/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/20/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/18/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice:

02/06/2019 - Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

02/05/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/25/2019 - Statement of Claim

Motion to Compel

03/05/2020 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

12/12/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

11/07/2019 - Motion to Compel

Response to Request for Admissions

11/06/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

AgreedOrder

11/04/2019 - AgreedOrder

Memorandum of Disposition

10/10/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion/petit for Enforcement

10/09/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

10/09/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

09/05/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF FILING DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3350008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/05/2019 REGISTER#:335CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560085AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less