This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/30/2019 at 19:42:10 (UTC).

DUARTE, HEIDY MERCEDES VS DELGADO, ROLANDO

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 DUARTE, HEIDY MERCEDES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DELGADO, ROLANDO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUARTE, HEIDY MERCEDES

Respondent

DELGADO, ROLANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bortolin, Sonia M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-9-19 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510022AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:BORTOLIN, SONIA M. 101 NE 3RD AVE STE 1500 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-1181 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.