This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/12/2020 at 13:51:47 (UTC).

DRY GUY'S, INC. A/A/O JANET ALFORD VS HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 DRY GUY'S, INC A/A/O JANFORD filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRY GUY'S, INC. A/A/O JANET ALFORD

Defendant

HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip A Ortiz

Defendant Attorney

Jaffe, Benjamin D., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/06/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/02/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulation

03/25/2020 - Stipulation

Pre Trial Summons

03/05/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Interrogatory

02/19/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/14/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/14/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/14/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700041AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PHILLIP A ORTIZ THE FIRM LAW GROUP 14100 PALMETTO FRONTAGE ROAD SU MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500018AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:PHILLIP A ORTIZ THE FIRM LAW GROUP 14100 PALMETTO FRONTAGE ROAD SU MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.