This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2020 at 22:52:31 (UTC).

DRY GUY'S, INC. A/A/O CARIDAD SIERRA VS MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 DRY GUY'S, INC A/A/O CARIDAD SIERRA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRY GUY'S, INC. A/A/O CARIDAD SIERRA

Defendant

MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip A Ortiz

Defendant Attorney

Trybus, Bruce M

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

04/06/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order of Dismissal

05/20/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Stipulation for Dismissal

05/20/2020 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

04/24/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

04/13/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

03/26/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Pre Trial Summons

03/05/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Interrogatory

02/19/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/14/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/14/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/14/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31942:4006; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700043AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PHILLIP A ORTIZ THE FIRM LAW GROUP 14100 PALMETTO FRONTAGE ROAD SU MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500023AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:PHILLIP A ORTIZ THE FIRM LAW GROUP 14100 PALMETTO FRONTAGE ROAD SU MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.