This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/04/2019 at 20:45:53 (UTC).

DR. RAMI TOUEG, INC. D/B/A BROOKSIDE CHIROPRACTIC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 DR RAMI TOUEG, INC D/B/A BROOKSIDE CHIROPRACTIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR. RAMI TOUEG, INC. d/b/a BROOKSIDE CHIROPRACTIC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Cameron, Roy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart L Koenigsberg Esq

Defendant Attorney

King, Ann H

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/04/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Motion for Default

03/06/2019 - Motion for Default

Request for Production

02/19/2019 - Request for Production

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

02/12/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

03/12/2019 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/02/2019 - Statement of Claim

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/12/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Request for Production

02/19/2019 - Request for Production

Memorandum of Disposition

02/13/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Extension of Time

03/05/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing:

02/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Compel

03/26/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

03/20/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

03/12/2019 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/13/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing:

01/23/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Pre Trial Summons

01/10/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700076AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/10/2019 REGISTER#:270CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440027AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:STUART L KOENIGSBERG ESQ 8877 SW 131ST ST MIAMI FL 33176-5909 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.