This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2021 at 09:15:58 (UTC).

DR. LEON GONYO D.C. PA VS MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 DR LEON GONYO D C PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR. LEON GONYO D.C. PA

Assignor

Hameetman, Ashley

Defendant

MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

11/02/2021 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

10/14/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AO 21-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120023AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/27/2021 REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010126AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.