This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/16/2022 at 02:32:30 (UTC).

DR CAR GLASS, LLC VS HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 DR CAR GLASS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR CAR GLASS, LLC

Assignor

REAL AUTO SALES, LLC

Defendant

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Martin I

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

08/09/2021 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

08/09/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/09/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/09/2021 - Request for Production

Voluntary Dismissal

09/10/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/10/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32737:1010; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2400056AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2021REGISTER#:240CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050169AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:BERGER, MARTIN I9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 850MIAMI FL 33156-2800COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:08/11/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where DR CAR GLASS LLC A/A/O BENJAMIN P COCHRAN, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Martin I